Financial history SPURGEONS

Charity number: 1081182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £10.29m £13.60m £13.43m £13.13m £14.16m
Total expenditure £10.41m £12.80m £12.85m £12.51m £12.80m
Income from government contracts £7.39m £10.95m £11.10m £11.12m £10.26m
Income from government grants £143.15k £502.76k £1.22m £1.05m £846.93k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.25m £1.78m £1.33m £1.57m £1.72m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £8.58m £11.37m £11.56m £11.16m £10.97m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £453.65k £457.67k £544.00k £395.00k £533.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £929.00k
Income - Legacies £156.75k £398.31k £148.70k £251.00k £479.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.96m £12.31m £12.37m £11.99m £12.21m
Expenditure - Raising funds £455.16k £486.92k £475.08k £516.00k £582.00k
Expenditure - Governance £61.00k £59.01k £61.44k £74.00k £63.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £76.07k £99.36k £79.92k £164.00k £134.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0