SHALOM CHRISTIAN HEALING CENTRE

Charity number: 1076595
Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £612 £442 £108 £40 £30
Total expenditure £482 £220 £222 £123 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A