Trustees CASPIAN HORSE SOCIETY
Charity number: 1076026
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Holderness-Roddam | Chair | 02 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Graves | Trustee | 29 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Georgina Rose Carrington | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Harry Thirlby | Trustee | 22 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sheilagh Nisbet | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Mann | Trustee | 11 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET DEDICOAT | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA SMATHERS | Trustee | 27 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Staines | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS VICKI SHORTIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PENNY WALSTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.