Trustees ADULTS LEARNING MATHEMATICS - A RESEARCH FORUM
Charity number: 1079462
Charity reporting is overdue by 25 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Elizabeth Mary Kelly | Chair | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dr Javier Diez-Palomar | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE BYRNE | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diane Dalby | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Arkenback-Sundstrom | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judy Larsen | Trustee | 11 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Ginsburg | Trustee | 04 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Jarlskog | Trustee | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MALCOLM KAYE | Trustee | 01 June 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.