Trustees CHANDLERS FORD U3A
Charity number: 1076319
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Jane Gilbert | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janine Richards | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Anne Moffat | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Wealleans | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Penelope Criswick | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Richard Criswick | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Mortimer Sales | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Claxton | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anne Lockley | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Claxton | Trustee | 22 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Hignett | Trustee | 20 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Allatt | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Staniforth | Trustee | 21 October 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.