MARY ATWOOD'S CHURCHES' CHARITY

Charity number: 1076260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 05/04/2016 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020
Total gross income £56.77k £57.67k £70.24k £69.12k £69.23k
Total expenditure £55.52k £57.71k £70.32k £67.89k £70.08k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A