The Earl and Countess of Wessex Charitable Trust

Charity number: 1076003
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £103.60k £3.16k £4.08k £770 £481
Total expenditure £133.35k £268.73k £135.14k £154.43k £57.58k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A