MID MEDIATION AND COUNSELLING LTD

Charity number: 1076166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £230.89k £239.76k £223.98k £219.05k £197.94k
Total expenditure £225.75k £237.87k £224.46k £203.13k £188.25k
Income from government contracts £57.62k £53.72k £29.21k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A