Financial history ST. EDITH'S HOME

Charity number: 1076029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £26.30k £25.66k £25.97k £26.98k £27.18k
Total expenditure £8.03k £20.09k £4.81k £68.30k £13.61k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A