FIFTY PLUS AGED ERITREAN WELFARE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1077984
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £4.13k £4.13k £9.51k £8.90k £9.32k
Total expenditure £3.54k £3.54k £4.81k £4.75k £6.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A