Trustees UK CARE 4 THAILAND
Charity number: 1078017
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RICHARD BURACK | Chair | 12 September 2000 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Stirrup | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Wiangyangkung | Trustee | 13 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mitchell Burack | Trustee | 16 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Luci Ducker-French | Trustee | 10 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr William Ford-Young | Trustee | 18 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Anne HASTINGS-ASATOURIAN | Trustee | 29 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
PAUL MEHLMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JENNY HURLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.