Accounts and annual returns THE KINGHAM HILL TRUST

Charity number: 1076618
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 April 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 20 April 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 09 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 09 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 28 May 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 11 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 11 April 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2017 02 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 02 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window