ST. JOHN'S (GRENADA)

Charity number: 1077814
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £3.00k £0 £0 £1.20k £1.91k
Total expenditure £2.50k £0 £0 £5.06k £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A