THE FRIENDS OF ST. GEORGE'S CHURCH , WROTHAM

Charity number: 1077671
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £13.24k £19.16k £10.16k £10.07k £11.16k
Total expenditure £1.38k £48.91k £11.31k £9.63k £8.68k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A