ST. MICHAEL'S SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1076999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £5.01m £5.09m £5.10m £5.48m £5.58m
Total expenditure £4.43m £4.70m £4.68m £4.89m £5.52m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £115.40k £16.26k £15.67k £56.07k £12.06k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.89m £5.06m £5.07m £5.40m £5.48m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £12.07k £9.04k £15.37k £25.40k £14.49k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £65.68k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.43m £4.70m £4.68m £4.89m £5.52m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.38k £11.85k £11.75k £11.75k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0