Governing document The Thomas Project
Charity number: 1082423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION ON 16 AUGUST 2000. as amended on 19 Jun 2018 as amended on 22 Aug 2021 as amended on 13 Sep 2021 as amended on 05 Apr 2022 as amended on 15 Apr 2023 as amended on 19 Sep 2023
Charitable objects
A; THE RELIEF OF HARDSHIP, NEED AND DISTRESS; AND B; THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
COUNTIES OF WEST MIDLANDS AND STAFFORD
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.