LEICESTER CHARITY ORGANISATION SOCIETY

Charity number: 1078271
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.27m £1.06m £762.45k £872.37k £903.43k
Total expenditure £1.30m £894.67k £845.84k £819.96k £829.94k
Income from government contracts £521.27k £190.30k £77.24k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £29.04k £77.24k £72.40k
Income - Donations and legacies £683.76k £827.20k £605.93k £724.60k £757.52k
Income - Other trading activities £48.75k £32.23k £32.95k £52.60k £52.25k
Income - Charitable activities £521.27k £190.30k £106.27k £77.24k £72.40k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.24k £14.98k £17.29k £17.94k £21.27k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £814 £0 £9.59k £25.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.23m £824.21k £774.72k £733.28k £757.88k
Expenditure - Raising funds £68.38k £70.45k £71.12k £86.68k £72.06k
Expenditure - Governance £10.55k £9.76k £39.15k £10.99k £11.47k
Expenditure - Grants institution £2.90k £13.15k £1.31k £3.61k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £665 £497 £590 £575 £573
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0