THE DURNFORD SOCIETY TRUST LTD

Charity number: 1077847
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £115.88k £106.65k £100.86k £82.35k £74.45k
Total expenditure £100.89k £104.98k £101.26k £92.74k £77.04k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A