BOSCASTLE COMMUNITY AND RECREATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1079091
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 03 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 10 February 2020 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 08 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 14 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required