Accounts and annual returns ALLEXTON / NEW PARKS JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB SUPPORTERS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1082323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 25 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 March 2022 329 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 March 2022 329 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 03 May 2020 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 18 June 2019 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 17 June 2019 413 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required