Financial history THE LIGHTSHIP - SALISBURY CHRISTIAN COUNSELLING TRUST

Charity number: 1077886
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £4.76k £4.33k £5.07k £6.67k £4.09k
Total expenditure £4.56k £4.47k £4.78k £5.06k £4.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A