Financial history COUNCIL FOR DANCE, DRAMA AND MUSICAL THEATRE

Charity number: 1079153
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021
Total gross income £293.28k £302.29k £320.19k £332.79k £271.38k
Total expenditure £271.83k £282.77k £291.26k £295.44k £239.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A