TREVERBYN C P SCHOOL PTA

Charity number: 1078399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £287 £450 £2.80k £3.19k £2.08k
Total expenditure £431 £378 £1.23k £2.20k £3.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A