Trustees CLEVELAND IRONSTONE MINING MUSEUM
Charity number: 1080246

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Adam Gaunt | Chair |
|
||||||||
Ken Hunter-Smith | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Briony Rachael Fox | Trustee | 27 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Christopher Twigg | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
DOROTHY POLLARD | Trustee | 27 March 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Colin Hart | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
IAN LESLIE WILSON | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
ELEANOR CUTHBERT | Trustee | 08 July 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Alan Chilton | Trustee | 10 April 2002 |
|
|||||||
JANETTE IRENE HOLT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.