TALE VALLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1079582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 11 November 2019 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 25 April 2020 177 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 09 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 02 November 2016 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required