TALE VALLEY TRUST

Charity number: 1079582
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £1.94k £7.84k £7.29k £48.12k £12.70k
Total expenditure £4.19k £4.28k £24.71k £7.00k £33.96k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £350