Financial history ARISE AND GLOW

Charity number: 1080498
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £21.72k £27.01k £29.15k £14.17k £11.71k
Total expenditure £21.68k £26.62k £26.97k £13.92k £11.16k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A