Accounts and annual returns WYCLIFFE COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1078286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 11 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 11 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 12 March 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 03 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 19 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 19 June 2018 On time Download Open in new window