Financial history WYCLIFFE COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1078286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £39.28k £57.57k £44.19k £35.94k £175.54k
Total expenditure £41.58k £47.76k £43.35k £45.48k £26.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A