Trustees WYCLIFFE COLLEGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1078286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Simon Frederick Modlin Lloyd Chair 31 August 2021
None on record
Brigadier Retired Robin John Bacon MBA FCIPD Trustee 01 January 2022
THE HONG KONG LEP TRUST
Received: On time
Caroline Jane Duckworth Trustee 13 December 2021
None on record
Thomas Patrick Wood FCA Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
Nicholas John Gregory BA, MEd Trustee 01 September 2015
None on record