Financial history THE JOHN PHILLIPS MILLENNIUM GREEN TRUST

Charity number: 1078840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £2.60k £2.67k £2.55k £1.50k £3.00k
Total expenditure £2.36k £2.63k £2.16k £3.14k £2.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A