The Friends of Little Melton Church Trust

Charity number: 1078896
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 16 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 30 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 25 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 24 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required