MULTI CULTURAL INTEGRATION CENTRE

Charity number: 1098620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £3.75k £0 £100 £0 £60
Total expenditure £3.25k £440 £144 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A