ST MICHAEL'S BREAST CARE GROUP

Charity number: 1080722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2020 30 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2019 13 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2018 26 April 2019 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2017 30 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2016 19 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2016 Not Required