ST MICHAEL'S BREAST CARE GROUP

Charity number: 1080722
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020
Total gross income £1.77k £3.29k £1.67k £1.00k £0
Total expenditure £975 £1.46k £11.01k £292 £80
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A