DORSET SCRAPSTORE

Charity number: 1081569
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £42.26k £56.52k £66.54k £60.71k £65.23k
Total expenditure £38.57k £56.28k £64.09k £57.33k £71.77k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A