Financial history ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION CRANWELL BRANCH

Charity number: 1078937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £10.15k £7.20k £12.34k £11.71k £4.59k
Total expenditure £8.67k £8.56k £11.40k £11.72k £2.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A