NORTH MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1087445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.81m £13.81m £15.45m £16.68m £15.96m
Total expenditure £14.40m £14.03m £14.73m £15.99m £14.74m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £419.45k £3.80m £3.77m £3.74m £4.04m
Income - Donations and legacies £7.99m £4.89m £5.21m £5.66m £6.19m
Income - Other trading activities £2.04m £2.36m £2.93m £3.53m £2.97m
Income - Charitable activities £6.56m £6.48m £6.97m £7.17m £6.46m
Income - Endowments £3.01m £669.44k £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £111.34k £221.19k £254.53k £230.22k £272.43k
Income - Other £119.50k £523.42k £92.96k £85.43k £70.52k
Income - Legacies £175.71k £12.28k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.24m £10.66m £9.40m £10.29m £9.33m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.16m £3.36m £5.33m £5.70m £5.41m
Expenditure - Governance £20.60k £20.14k £16.00k £16.50k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £60.38k £37.64k £0 £40.79k £42.69k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0