NORTH MUSIC TRUST

Charity number: 1087445
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

18 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marianne Dora Sice Trustee 06 June 2019 None on record
Mike Barker Trustee 11 December 2021 None on record
Young Herb Kim Trustee 08 December 2016
THE DAVID AND JANE RICHARDS FAMILY FOUNDATION Received: 101 days late
Gabriel Francis Patrick Day Trustee 17 September 2021 None on record
TONY WADSWORTH CBE Trustee 13 September 2018
BRITISH RECORD INDUSTRY TRUST Received: On time
UNIVERSAL MUSIC UK SOUND FOUNDATION Received: On time
HILARY PATRICIA FLOREK Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record
Jacqui Hodgson Trustee 17 September 2021 None on record
Caroline Jackson Trustee 13 September 2018 None on record
Sir Martin James Narey Trustee 08 December 2016
SIRIUS MINERALS FOUNDATION LIMITED Received: On time
Darren Collins Trustee 11 December 2020 None on record
Ruth Lyon Trustee 17 September 2021 None on record
Oliver Mack Trustee 17 September 2021 None on record
Joanna Lawson Trustee 17 September 2021 None on record
Roy James McEwan-Brown Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record
Vidya Sarangapani Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record
Emily Cox MBE Trustee 07 June 2018 None on record
Jane Spiers Trustee 13 September 2018 None on record
Subashis Das Trustee 08 December 2016 None on record