Accounts and annual returns Tranby Trust

Charity number: 1079653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 09 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 06 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 06 January 2020 190 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 06 January 2020 190 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 03 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required