Financial history Tranby Trust

Charity number: 1079653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £27.48k £12.94k £19.90k £12.21k £12.27k
Total expenditure £20.60k £22.24k £29.71k £21.51k £21.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A