Trustees THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR SEED SCIENCE

Charity number: 1081225
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Gabriela Auge Trustee 13 August 2021
None on record
Dr Fiona Hay Trustee 13 August 2021
None on record
Dr Laura Bowden Trustee 25 October 2018
None on record
Dr Julia Buitink Trustee 14 September 2017
None on record
Dr Steven Penfield Trustee 19 September 2014
None on record
Dr CHRISTOPHER WEST Trustee 19 September 2014
None on record
PROFESSOR HUGH WYNFORD PRITCHARD Trustee 05 September 2011
THE SOCIETY FOR LOW TEMPERATURE BIOLOGY
Received: On time
GERD LEUBNER Trustee 05 September 2011
None on record