THE SOCIETY OF LOCAL AUTHORITY CHIEF EXECUTIVES AND SENIOR MANAGERS (SOLACE GROUP) LTD

Charity number: 1084419
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £958.35k £5.57m £4.75m £6.36m £7.55m
Total expenditure £3.43k £5.70m £4.73m £6.21m £7.40m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £173.09k £322.65k £528.84k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £739.92k £0 £0 £75 £2.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £4.26m £3.24m £4.61m £5.70m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £1.31m £1.51m £1.75m £1.84m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.26k £3.06k £2.90k £4.17k £4.34k
Income - Other £215.17k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.51k £1.75m £1.81m £2.07m £2.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.92k £1.99k £1.85k £4.14m £5.14m
Expenditure - Governance £1.51k £107.58k £42.35k £47.74k £39.59k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £1.92k £1.99k £1.85k £2.19k £2.17k
Expenditure - Other £0 £3.95m £2.92m £0 £0