Trustees PICKER INSTITUTE EUROPE
Charity number: 1081688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Victoria Thomas | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Flashman | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Charles Danby Bloch | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tahreema Matin | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Peter Douglas Collins | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Coulter PhD | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Levy | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Tim Irish | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Magdalena Skrybant | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gary Ford | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.