Financial history WORCESTER AND DISTRICT DEAF CHILDREN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 1080285
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £20.25k £12.57k £2.71k £3.02k £400
Total expenditure £12.33k £6.97k £5.88k £2.71k £1.01k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A