COVENT GARDEN DRAGON HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1087268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £331.64k £488.72k £569.32k £706.52k £659.83k
Total expenditure £309.99k £535.51k £440.10k £512.88k £702.53k
Income from government contracts £10.60k £0 £197.00k £198.00k £180.00k
Income from government grants £146.12k £80.21k £45.00k £45.00k £45.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £0 £4.50k £2.65k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £7.92k £102.69k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £482.93k £564.75k £649.54k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A £78.48k £34.57k £7.64k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £440.10k £512.88k £702.53k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £24.67k £6.00k £24.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0