COVENT GARDEN DRAGON HALL TRUST

Charity number: 1087268
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jeffrey Graeme Hopwood Trustee 26 July 2018
THE PHOENIX GARDEN
ENFIELD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX Received: 16 days late
Francis Lluvert Go Trustee 26 July 2018
THE PHOENIX GARDEN
Garrard Knowles Trustee 15 September 2020
THE PHOENIX GARDEN Received: On time
THE PHOENIX GARDEN
CLAUDE ASGILL Trustee 09 September 2013 None on record
Sue Vincent Chair
THE PHOENIX GARDEN Received: On time
THE PHOENIX GARDEN
COVENT GARDEN SOCIAL AND CRAFTS CENTRE ASSOCIATION
CATHERINE MATHESON Trustee 05 May 2011
THE PHOENIX GARDEN
Alexander James Lloyd Trustee 26 July 2018
THE PHOENIX GARDEN
John Joseph Quigley Trustee 30 October 2014 None on record
Tim Lynn Trustee 14 September 2017 None on record
Simon Bruegger Trustee 01 April 2014
THE PHOENIX GARDEN