Accounts and annual returns The International Medical Education Trust

Charity number: 1081287
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 06 May 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 11 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 28 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 23 March 2018 On time Download Open in new window