Accounts and annual returns THE MANSFIELD WOODHOUSE SOCIETY

Charity number: 1083230
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2021 21 March 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 21 March 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 06 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 06 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2019 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 25 October 2019 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2018 02 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 29 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required