FOREST PEOPLES PROGRAMME

Charity number: 1082158
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.87m £5.37m £3.84m £4.44m £4.37m
Total expenditure £4.04m £5.54m £4.52m £4.19m £4.17m
Income from government contracts £0 £231.99k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £839.97k £957.63k £218.57k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £23.32k £27.68k £33.28k £178.10k £39.27k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.83m £5.30m £3.74m £4.24m £4.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £4.54k £7.94k £5.76k £6.94k £5.06k
Income - Other £17.85k £31.79k £53.57k £21.58k £17.05k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.01m £5.52m £4.50m £4.14m £4.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £29.67k £26.23k £26.38k £51.55k £57.61k
Expenditure - Governance £59.55k £46.00k £46.88k £0 £33.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.30m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0